GA HB171 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 50-18-72 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to exemptions to requirements for disclosure of public records, so as to provide that public disclosure shall not be required for certain personal contact information of individuals obtained by a local government; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public records; exemptions to requirements for disclosure; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-05 - House - House Vote #148 - Pass (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-11 | Senate Recommitted | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-05 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-05 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-03 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-01-29 | House Second Readers | |
2009-01-28 | House First Readers |