GA HB165 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 3 of Title 3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to prohibited acts regarding alcoholic beverages, so as to provide that counties and municipalities with approval of the local housing authority board of commissioners may provide certain exceptions relating to the sale of alcoholic beverages for consumption on the premises near housing authority property; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Alcoholic beverage sales; housing authority board; provide certain exceptions
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Tom Dickson [R] | Rep. Sean Jerguson [R] | Rep. Billy Mitchell [D] |
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Roger Williams [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-02-16 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-07 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-03 | House First Readers |