GA HB163 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 7 of Chapter 4 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to medical assistance generally, so as to direct the Department of Community Health to submit a state plan amendment to implement express lane enrollment in Medicaid; to direct the Department of Human Services to automatically enroll and renew eligible children in Medicaid, based on application data received for the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Community Health, Department of; submit state plan amendment to implement express lane enrollment in Medicaid; direct
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Houston Gaines [R] | Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Rep. Spencer Frye [D] |
Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Mesha Mainor [D] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #206 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Passage: House Vote #48 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Passage: House Vote #48 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-04 | Act 178 | |
2021-05-04 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-02-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-28 | House | House Hopper |