GA HB160 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 9 of Title 32 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to mass transportation, so as to create the Georgia Commission on Transit Governance and Funding; to provide for the membership, powers, and duties of the commission; to provide for a report and proposal by the commission; to provide for assignment of the commission to the Department of Transportation for administrative purposes; to provide for cooperation of other government entities with the commission; to provide for other services to the commission; to provide for compensation and expenses; to provide for automatic repeal; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Mass transportation; create Georgia Commission on Transit Governance and Funding, provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] | Rep. Christian Coomer [R] | Rep. James Shaw [R] | Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] |
Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Vote #60 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Vote #60 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-02-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-01-31 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-01-30 | House | House First Readers |
2017-01-26 | House | House Hopper |