GA HB16 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 35 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding law enforcement officers and agencies, so as to prohibit the possession of certain property from the United States Department of Defense by certain local law enforcement agencies; to provide for a definition; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Stop Militarizing Law Enforcement Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Viola Davis [D] | Rep. Kim Schofield [D] | Rep. Dar'shun Kendrick [D] |
Rep. Shelly Hutchinson [D] | Rep. Park Cannon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-01-26 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-14 | House | House Hopper |
2020-11-16 | House | House Prefiled |