GA HB1565 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective Date 2022-04-25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective Date 2022-04-25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create the Savannah Development and Renewal Authority, approved May 4, 1992 (Ga. L. 1992, p. 6764), so as to revise provisions related to the appointment of authority members; to revise notice requirements regarding appointment of members; to revise quorum provisions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Savannah Development and Renewal Authority; members; revise provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Derek Mallow [D] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Carl Gilliard [D] | Rep. Edna Jackson [D] |
Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #718 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - Supplemental Local Calendar : House Vote #762 (Y: 152 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - Supplemental Local Calendar : House Vote #762 (Y: 152 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Effective Date 2022-04-25 | |
2022-04-25 | Act 680 | |
2022-04-25 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-16 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-15 | House | House Hopper |