GA HB156 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Titles 38 and 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to military, emergency management, and veterans affairs and state government, respectively, so as to facilitate the sharing of information and reporting of cyber attacks; to require governmental agencies and utilities to report any cyber attacks to the director of emergency management and homeland security; to provide for definitions; to provide for the director to promulgate certain rules and regulations; to provide for proceedings related to cybersecurity to be held in executive session; to provide for certain information, data, and reports related to cybersecurity and cyber attacks to be exempt from public disclosure and inspection; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military; sharing of information and reporting of cyber attacks; facilitate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-11 - House - Agree Sen Sub: House Vote #250 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #167 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - Passage: House Vote #68 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25 Effective Date
2021-03-25 Act 8
2021-03-25HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2021-03-25HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2021-03-11HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2021-03-08SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-08SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-08SenateSenate Taken from Table
2021-03-08SenateSenate Tabled
2021-03-05SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-03-03SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-23SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-22HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-02-22HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-02-10HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-01HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-01-29HouseHouse First Readers
2021-01-28HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback