GA HB15 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Senate Conference Committee Appointed 46th, 30th, 19th
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to courts, so as to require certain civil pleadings to be filed electronically in superior and state courts; to change provisions relating to electronic filings and payments; to provide for fees; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courts; certain civil pleadings to be filed electronically; require

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #284 (Y: 15 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #285 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #182 (Y: 168 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed 46th, 30th, 19th
2017-03-30HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed 51st, 16th, 121st
2017-03-30HouseHouse Insisted
2017-03-30SenateSenate Insisted
2017-03-30HouseHouse Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub
2017-03-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-28SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-20SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-20SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-03SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-03HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-03HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-31HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-30HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-26HouseHouse Hopper
2016-12-02HouseHouse Prefiled

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20172018/HB/15
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/162581.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/163660.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/166142.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/167440.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/168772.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/169934.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/169935.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/169986.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/170052.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/169991.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/170038.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/170084.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15010
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15355
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15354

Bill Comments

feedback