GA HB1496 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act which provides a homestead exemption for each resident of Spalding County who is totally disabled or 62 years of age or older and who has less than $12,500.00 per year of specified income, approved March 26, 1986 (Ga. L. 1986, p. 4514), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 4, 1991 (Ga. L. 1991, p. 4514), so as to increase the income level to qualify for such exemption; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Spalding County; homestead exemption; qualifying income level; increase
Sponsors
Rep. David Knight [R] | Rep. John Yates [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #810 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-02 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-02 | Act 580 | |
2010-06-02 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-07 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-04-14 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-14 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-14 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-04-13 | House Second Readers | |
2010-04-12 | House First Readers |