GA HB1492 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for an advisory referendum election to be held in Bacon County for the purpose of ascertaining whether the voters of such county desire the Bacon County Board of Elections and Registration to divide the county into multiple election precincts so as to permit voters to vote closer to their residence; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Bacon County; advisory referendum election; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Tommy Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #810 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-02 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-02 | Act 561 | |
2010-06-02 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-05 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-04-14 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-14 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-14 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-04-13 | House Second Readers | |
2010-04-12 | House First Readers |