GA HB1491 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act relating to regulation and taxation of electricity used as motor fuel and electric vehicle charging stations, approved May 2, 2023, (Ga. L. 2023, p. 376/SB 146), so as to extend the effective date of provisions relative to regulatory authority of the Department of Agriculture and revenue and taxation; to amend Article 8A of Chapter 1 of Title 10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to electric vehicle charging stations, so as to revise and provide for standards for display of electricity dispensed by electric vehicle charging stations; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Agriculture, Department of; regulatory authority; extend effective date of provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-03-18 | House | House First Readers |
2024-03-14 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/68891 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/227472 |