GA HB1488 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Effective Date 2022-03-23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Effective Date 2022-03-23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Pelham, approved April 28, 2016 (Ga. L. 2016, p. 3859), as amended, so as to revise provisions relating to the composition and elections of the City of Pelham Board of Education; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Pelham, City of; Board of Education; composition; revise provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #691 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #653 (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #653 (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Effective Date 2022-03-23 | |
2022-03-23 | Act 583 | |
2022-03-23 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-03-23 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-03 | House | House Hopper |