GA HB1468 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Dade County Water and Sewer Authority, approved March 25, 1958 (Ga. L. 1958, p. 3260), as amended, so as to provide for the composition of the authority; to provide for the selection of members of the authority; to provide for the terms of office for members of the authority; to provide for vacancies; to provide for certain duties of the authority; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Dade County Water and Sewer Authority; composition; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #743 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-11 | Act 358 | |
2010-05-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-04 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-31 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-31 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-31 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-30 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-26 | House First Readers |