GA HB1454 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Effective Date 2024-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Effective Date 2024-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Board of Commissioners of Fulton County, approved December 3, 1880 (Ga. L. 1880-81, p. 508), as amended, so as to provide for compensation of the chairperson and other members of the board of commissioners; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Fulton County; Board of Commissioners; provide compensation for chairperson and members
Sponsors
Rep. Sheila Jones [D] | Rep. Roger Bruce [D] | Rep. Stacey Evans [D] | Rep. Esther Panitch [D] |
Rep. Shea Roberts [D] | Rep. Inga Willis [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #761 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #687 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #687 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Effective Date 2024-07-01 | |
2024-05-06 | Act 671 | |
2024-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2024-03-05 | House | House Hopper |