GA HB143 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 36 and Title 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating, respectively, to local government and public officers and employees, so as to change the manner and method of appropriating funds for homeowner tax relief grants; to provide for procedures, conditions, and limitations; to change certain provisions regarding certain reservation authority for appropriations; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local government; homeowner tax relief grants; change certain provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Burkalter [R] | Rep. Earl Ehrhart [R] | Rep. Benjie Harbin [R] | Rep. Jerry Keen [R] |
Rep. Larry O'Neal [R] | Sen. Tommie Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-02-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #28 - Reconsideration (Y: 23 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-02-06 - Senate - Senate Vote #26 - Passage (Y: 29 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-02-06 - Senate - Senate Vote #24 - Motion To Engross (Y: 29 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-02-06 - House - House Vote #30 - Im Trans To Governor (Y: 135 N: 26 NV: 8 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2009-01-30 - House - House Vote #12 - Pass (Y: 117 N: 55 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2009-02-06 - Senate - Senate Vote #26 - Passage (Y: 29 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-02-06 - Senate - Senate Vote #24 - Motion To Engross (Y: 29 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-02-06 - House - House Vote #30 - Im Trans To Governor (Y: 135 N: 26 NV: 8 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2009-01-30 - House - House Vote #12 - Pass (Y: 117 N: 55 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-17 | Effective Date | |
2009-02-17 | Act 1 | |
2009-02-17 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-02-17 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-02-06 | Senate Notice to Reconsider | |
2009-02-06 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-02-06 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-02-05 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-02-04 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-01-30 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-01-30 | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate | |
2009-01-30 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-01-30 | House Third Readers | |
2009-01-28 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-01-27 | House Second Readers | |
2009-01-26 | House First Readers |