GA HB1418 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Effective Date 2022-04-18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Effective Date 2022-04-18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for a new charter for the county-wide government of Columbus, Georgia, approved April 5, 1993 (Ga. L. 1993, p. 4978), as amended, so as authorize a tax for public health care purposes; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Columbus, City of; tax for public health care purposes; authorize
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #676 (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #653 (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #653 (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Effective Date 2022-04-18 | |
2022-04-18 | Act 639 | |
2022-04-18 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-22 | House | House Hopper |