GA HB1359 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 12-7-6 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to best management practices and minimum requirements for rules, regulations, ordinances, or resolutions, so as to provide an exception for a required buffer along state waters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Best management practices; required buffer along state waters; provide exception
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #800 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-27 | Act 481 | |
2010-05-27 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-07 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-27 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-26 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-24 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-18 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-16 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-11 | House First Readers |