GA HB1343 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-26 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-26 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 42-8-34 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to hearings for and determinations of probation in criminal cases, so as to change the amount of certain fees charged to probationers; to change provisions relating to the waiver of such fees under certain circumstances and sanctions for failure to pay fees; to provide for the mandatory nature of fees charged to defendants sentenced to day reporting centers as a condition of probation; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Criminal cases; fees charged to probationers; change amount; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Jill Chambers [R] | Rep. Doug Collins [R] | Rep. Charles Martin [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] |
Rep. Richard Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | House Third Reading Lost | |
2010-03-26 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-11 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-10 | House First Readers |