GA HB1330 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to imposition, rate, computation, exemptions, and credits from state income tax, so as to provide that all expenditures of a production company's state certified productions may be combined to meet spending thresholds; to lower spending thresholds; to increase the value of the tax credit; to provide for transferability of the tax credit; to provide for conditions and limitations; to revise a definition; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Music and Theatre Jobs Recovery Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] | Rep. Kasey Carpenter [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Josh Bonner [R] |
Rep. Carl Gilliard [D] | Rep. Teri Anulewicz [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - House - Passage: House Vote #696 (Y: 146 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-14 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-11 | House | House Hopper |