GA HB1326 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Act 411
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Act 411
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 13 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to controlled substances, so as to provide for certain provisions relating to Schedule I controlled substances, Schedule III controlled substances, and Schedule IV controlled substances; to provide for certain provisions relating to the definition of dangerous drugs; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; Schedule I, Schedule III, and Schedule IV controlled substances; provide certain provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] |
Sen. Ben Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #707 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #627 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #627 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Act 411 | |
2024-04-22 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-20 | House | House Hopper |