GA HB1316 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a new charter for the City of Cordele, approved July 29, 2020 (Ga. L. 2020, p. 4122), so as to transition the office of chairperson to at large commission member; to provide for a mayor to be selected by and among the commission members; to redesignate the office of vice chairperson to mayor pro tempore; to revise voting and quorum provisions related to the commission; to make conforming changes; to provide that the city manager shall recommend the annual budget to the commission in place of the chairperson; to provide that the chairperson on the effective date of this Act shall become the initial at large commission member; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cordele, City of; transition office of chairperson to at large commission member; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #537 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-20 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/67189 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/224584 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/67189#23012 |