GA HB1314 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 30 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Council on Developmental Disabilities, so as to provide for the comprehensive regulation of individual development accounts; to provide for definitions; to provide for procedures, conditions, and limitations with respect to the creation and operation of such accounts; to provide for powers, duties, and authority of the Georgia Council on Developmental Disabilities; to provide for powers, duties, and authority of certain fiduciary organizations; to amend Code Section 49-4-183 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to administration of article by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Disabilities, so as to add to uses for individual development accounts; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Council on Developmental Disabilities; regulate developmental accounts; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Cecily Hill [R] | Rep. Margaret Kaiser [D] | Rep. Howard Mosby [D] | Rep. Donna Sheldon [R] |
Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #857 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-26 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-24 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-18 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-10 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-09 | House First Readers |