GA HB1292 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Effective Date 2024-05-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Effective Date 2024-05-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 44 of the O.C.G.A., relating to recordation and registration of deeds and other instruments, so as to require that the clerks of the superior courts obtain photographic identification cards of individuals who present deeds or other instruments for recording; to require such clerks retain certain information relating to deeds or other instruments presented for recording; to provide for exceptions; to provide for the promulgation of rules and regulations; to amend Titles 23 and 51 of the O.C.G.A., relating to equity and torts, respectively, so as to provide remedies for fraudulently recorded deeds or other instruments; to provide for the recovery of costs and attorney's fees in certain quiet title actions; to provide for a civil cause of action for the recording of fraudulent or forged deeds or other instruments; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Property; clerks of superior courts obtain photographic identification cards of individuals who present deeds or other instruments for recording; require
Sponsors
Rep. Gabe Okoye [D] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. James Beverly [D] |
Rep. Matt Reeves [R] | Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] | Sen. Russ Goodman [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-29 - House - Agree To Senate Substitute: House Vote #888 (Y: 166 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #839 (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #614 (Y: 168 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #839 (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #614 (Y: 168 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Effective Date 2024-05-02 | |
2024-05-02 | Act 549 | |
2024-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-16 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-15 | House | House Hopper |