GA HB1292 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create the Colquitt County Family Connection Collaborative on Children and Families, approved April 13, 2001 (Ga. L. 2001, p. 4117), so as to change the membership; to change the quorum; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Colquitt County Family Connection Collaborative on Children and Families; change membership
Sponsors
Rep. Penny Houston [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Ed Rynders [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #572 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-11 | Act 356 | |
2010-05-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-11 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-11 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-11 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-10 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-09 | House First Readers |