GA HB1285 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Effective Date 2022-03-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Effective Date 2022-03-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Muscogee County School District, approved February 25, 1949 (Ga. L. 1949, p. 1086), as amended, so as to change the description of the education districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for continuation in office of current members; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Muscogee County; Board of Education; change description of districts
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] | Rep. Carolyn Hugley [D] | Rep. Debbie Buckner [D] |
Rep. Vance Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #532 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #506 (Y: 144 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #506 (Y: 144 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Effective Date 2022-03-02 | |
2022-03-02 | Act 548 | |
2022-03-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-03-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-08 | House | House Hopper |