GA HB1268 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for a new homestead exemption from Hall County ad valorem taxes for county purposes in an amount equal to the amount by which the current year assessed value of a homestead exceeds the adjusted base year assessed value of such homestead; to provide for definitions; to specify the terms and conditions of the exemption and the procedures relating thereto; to provide for applicability; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal; to provide for mandatory execution of election and judicial remedies regarding failure to comply; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Hall County; ad valorem tax; county purposes; provide homestead exemption
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Matt Dubnik [R] | Rep. Emory Dunahoo [R] | Rep. Derrick McCollum [R] |
Rep. David Clark [R] | Rep. Soo Hong [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #646 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #521 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #521 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-13 | House | House Hopper |