GA HB1266 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Titles 12, 32, and 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to conservation and natural resources, highways, bridges, and ferries, and state government, respectively, so as to provide for a system whereby certain local governments may seek certifications from the Department of Community Affairs upon the enactment of certain policies that can be used to receive priority in grant and loan applications submitted to state agencies; to provide for related matters; to provide a short title; to provide legislative findings; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Community Housing Options Increase Cost Efficiency Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Washburn [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Clint Crowe [R] |
Rep. Beth Camp [R] | Rep. Spencer Frye [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-13 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/67024 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/223978 |