GA HB126 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 10 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to obstruction of public administration and related offenses, so as to provide a definition; to prohibit any person from knowingly and willfully obstructing or hindering any park ranger in the lawful discharge of such park ranger's official duties; to prohibit any person from knowingly and willfully resisting, obstructing, or opposing any park ranger in the lawful discharge of such park ranger's official duties by offering or doing violence to the person of such park ranger; to provide for penalties; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Park rangers; any person obstructing or hindering the lawful discharge of official duties; prohibit
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hamilton [R] | Rep. Mike Dudgeon [R] | Rep. Geoff Duncan [R] | Rep. Carlton Rogers [R] |
Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #199 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House Vote #76 (Y: 167 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House Vote #76 (Y: 167 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-06 | Act 199 | |
2013-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-02-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-02-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2013-01-28 | House | House Hopper |