GA HB1231 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 20-3-519.2 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to eligibility requirements for a HOPE scholarship and award amount, to allow academically successful students who are concurrently seeking a baccalaureate degree and a first professional degree to use the full number of hours of HOPE scholarship eligibility; to allow academically successful students who commence a graduate program at an eligible postsecondary institution within 18 months of earning a baccalaureate degree to use the full number of hours of HOPE scholarship eligibility; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Postsecondary education; allow academically successful students to use the full number of hours of HOPE scholarship eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - Agree To Senate Substitute: House Vote #879 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #816 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #597 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #816 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #597 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-12 | House | House Hopper |