GA HB1228 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Effective Date 2022-03-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Effective Date 2022-03-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Board of Commissioners of Lamar County, approved March 8, 1943 (Ga. L. 1943, p. 1066), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 13, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 4422), so as to reconstitute the board of commissioners; to change the description of the commissioner districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for continuation in office of current members; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Lamar County; Board of Commissioners; reconstitute and change description of districts
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Camp [R] | Rep. David Knight [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #525 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #506 (Y: 144 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #506 (Y: 144 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Effective Date 2022-03-02 | |
2022-03-02 | Act 541 | |
2022-03-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-03-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-07 | House | House Hopper |