GA HB1217 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, the "Quality Basic Education Act," so as to provide for the inclusion of methods for the promotion of the safe and appropriate use of technology and responsible digital citizenship in the comprehensive character education program; to repeal a provision regarding applicability; to provide for implementation; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Student Technology Protection Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Erwin [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Matt Dubnik [R] | Rep. Lauren McDonald [R] |
Rep. Karen Mathiak [R] | Rep. Lynn Smith [R] | Sen. Bo Hatchett [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - Passage: House Vote #558 (Y: 131 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-02-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-03 | House | House Hopper |