GA HB1217 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create the South Fulton Municipal Regional Water and Sewer Authority, approved April 19, 2000 (Ga. L. 2000, p. 3739), so as to change the name of the authority; to revise provisions regarding notice of regular meetings; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Middle Chattahoochee Regional Water and Sewer Authority Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Derrick Jackson [D] | Rep. Debra Bazemore [D] | Rep. Roger Bruce [D] | Rep. William Boddie [D] |
Rep. Sharon Beasley-Teague [D] | Rep. Philip Singleton [R] | Sen. Nikema Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #774 (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Vote #692 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Vote #692 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-30 | Act 438 | |
2020-06-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-06-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-06-17 | House | House First Readers |
2020-06-16 | House | House Hopper |