GA HB1215 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act revising, superseding, and consolidating the laws creating and governing the Board of Commissioners of Echols County, approved February 3, 1953 (Ga. L. 1953, Jan.-Feb. Sess., p. 2054), as amended, so as to provide for elections and terms of office; to provide for submission under the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Echols County; Board of Commissioners; provide for elections and terms of office
Sponsors
Sen. Ellis Black [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #648 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House Vote #690 - Local Calendar W/o Hb 1214 (Y: 158 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House Vote #690 - Local Calendar W/o Hb 1214 (Y: 158 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Effective Date | |
2012-03-27 | Act 432 | |
2012-03-27 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-03-26 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-20 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-14 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-13 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-13 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-13 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-12 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-07 | House First Readers |