GA HB1202 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-20 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-20 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create a board of elections and registration for Fulton County, Georgia, approved March 30, 1989 (Ga. L. 1989, p. 4577), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 7, 2019 (Ga. L. 2019, p. 4181), so as to provide for abolition of the board on a date certain; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Fulton County; board of elections and registration; provide for abolition of the board on a date certain
Sponsors
Sen. Josh McLaurin [D] | Rep. David Dreyer [D] | Rep. William Boddie [D] | Rep. Derrick Jackson [D] |
Rep. Kim Schofield [D] | Rep. Angelika Kausche [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-19 - House - House Vote #666 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-06-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-06-17 | House | House First Readers |
2020-06-16 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/58419 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/193609 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/58419#17795 |