GA HB1188 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the Oak Grove Cemetery Authority; to provide for its purposes, funding, responsibilities, jurisdiction, membership, meetings, records, filling of vacancies, powers and duties, and application of conflicts of interest and ethics provisions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Oak Grove Cemetery Authority; create
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #622 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Vote #622 - Local Calendar (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Vote #622 - Local Calendar (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-11 | Act 522 | |
2012-04-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-13 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-13 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-07 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-07 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-05 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-29 | House First Readers |