GA HB1176 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the Fannin County Water Authority; to provide a short title; to define certain terms; to provide for membership, appointment, terms, cooperation, quorums, and officers of the authority; to provide for a director; to provide for purposes; to provide for powers; to limit the exercise of eminent domain by the authority; to provide for ordinance proposals; to provide for tax exemption; to provide for construction; to provide for cumulative nature of powers; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Fannin County Water Authority Act; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #554 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - House - House Vote #583 - Local Calendar (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - House - House Vote #583 - Local Calendar (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Effective Date | |
2010-04-07 | Act 350 | |
2010-04-07 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-04-07 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-08 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-02-18 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-02-18 | House Third Readers | |
2010-02-18 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-17 | House Second Readers | |
2010-02-16 | House First Readers |