GA HB1174 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL To be entitled an Act to create the Newton County Public Facilities Authority and to provide for the appointment of members of the authority; to provide for a short title; to confer powers upon the authority; to provide for purpose and scope of operations of the authority; to provide for definitions; to authorize the issuance of revenue bonds of the authority; to fix and provide the venue and jurisdiction of actions relating to any provisions of this Act; to provide for moneys received and trust funds; to provide for tort immunity; to provide for tax exemption, rates, charges, and revenues; to provide for effect on other governments; to provide for construction of act and severability; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Newton County Public Facilities Authority Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Pam Dickerson [D] | Rep. Dave Belton [R] | Rep. Dale Rutledge [R] | Rep. Andrew Welch [R] |
Sen. Brian Strickland [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #719 (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - House - House Vote #666 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - House - House Vote #666 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 350 | |
2020-06-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-06-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-06-16 | House | House First Readers |
2020-06-15 | House | House Hopper |