GA HB1165 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Effective Date 2024-04-22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Effective Date 2024-04-22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 35-6A-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to membership, vacancies, and membership not bar to holding public office, so as to replace the chairperson of the Governor's Office of Children and Families with the commissioner of the Georgia Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Disabilities on the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Criminal Justice Coordinating Council; replace chairperson of the Governor's Office of Children and Families with the commissioner of the Georgia Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Disabilities
Sponsors
Rep. Mesha Mainor [D] | Rep. Matt Reeves [R] | Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Rep. Butch Parrish [R] |
Rep. Scott Hilton [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - Agree To Senate Substitute: House Vote #843 (Y: 168 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #779 (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - Passage: House Vote #543 (Y: 167 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #779 (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - Passage: House Vote #543 (Y: 167 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Effective Date 2024-04-22 | |
2024-04-22 | Act 409 | |
2024-04-22 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-06 | House | House Hopper |