GA HB1165 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to repeal an Act creating the Joint Liberty County, City of Gum Branch, City of Midway, City of Riceboro, and City of Walthourville Fire Protection Facilities and Equipment Authority, approved April 5, 1994 (Ga. L. 1994, p. 4826), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 6, 2019 (Ga. L. 2019, p. 3920); to provide for the assets and liabilities thereof; to provide for related matters; to provide a specific repealer; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Joint Liberty County, City of Gum Branch, City of Midway, City of Riceboro, and City of Walthourville Fire Protection Facilities and Equipment Authority; repeal Act
Sponsors
Rep. Al Williams [D] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #774 (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #704 (Y: 155 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #704 (Y: 155 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 349 | |
2020-06-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-06-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-12 | House | House Hopper |