GA HB1162 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the governing authority of the City of Blue Ridge to levy an excise tax pursuant to subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A.; to provide procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Blue Ridge, City of; levy an excise tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #663 (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - House Vote #649 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - House Vote #649 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 348 | |
2020-06-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-06-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-12 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-12 | House | House Hopper |