GA HB1160 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 2 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Uvalda; to provide for re-incorporation, boundaries, and powers of the city; to provide for related matters; to provide for severability; to repeal a specific Act; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uvalda, City of; provide new charter

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #663 (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - House Vote #649 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-02HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2020-06-20SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2020-06-20SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2020-06-17SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-06-16HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2020-06-16HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-06-16HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2020-03-13HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-03-12HouseHouse First Readers
2020-03-10HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback