GA HB1145 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Calhoun, Georgia, approved April 8, 1983 (Ga. L. 1983, p. 4710), as amended, so as to provide terms of office and qualifications for the mayor, councilmembers, and members of the board of education; to provide dates for general municipal elections; to provide for removal of the mayor and councilmembers; to provide for removal of municipal court judges; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Calhoun, City of; terms and qualifications for the mayor, councilmembers and board of education members; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #663 (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - House Vote #649 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - House Vote #649 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 344 | |
2020-06-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-06-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-10 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-09 | House | House Hopper |