GA HB1138 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act reincorporating the City of Doraville in the County of DeKalb, approved October 13, 1971 (Ga. L. 1971, Ex. Sess., p. 2154), as amended, so as to change the corporate limits; to authorize certain tax exemptions; to prohibit certain annexation efforts; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Doraville, City of; change corporate limits; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #707 (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Vote #750 (Y: 155 N: 4 NV: 11 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Vote #750 (Y: 155 N: 4 NV: 11 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-29 | Act 654 | |
2014-04-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-27 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-03-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-03-10 | House | House First Readers |
2014-03-10 | House | House Hopper |