GA HB1131 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - House Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - House Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for the levy of a retail sales and use tax by the City of Atlanta for the purpose of providing public transportation of passengers for hire in the metropolitan area of the City of Atlanta; to provide for definitions; to provide for procedures, conditions, and limitations for the imposition of such tax; to provide for selection of projects for such purposes; to provide for a referendum; to provide for an additional referendum in certain instances; to provide for a limitation on the collection of a tax for transportation purposes in certain counties in certain instances; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Atlanta, City of; levy a retail sales and use tax
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Gardner [D] | Rep. Margaret Kaiser [D] | Rep. Marie Metze [D] | Rep. Stacey Abrams [D] |
Rep. Taylor Bennett [D] | Rep. Howard Mosby [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | House Postponed |
2016-03-16 | House | House Postponed |
2016-03-15 | House | House Postponed |
2016-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-03-10 | House | House First Readers |
2016-03-08 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/48973 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/159614 |