GA HB1131 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create a board of elections and registration for Hall County and to provide for its powers and duties; to provide for related matters; to provide effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Hall County; create board of elections and registration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #707 (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Vote #732 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Vote #732 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-10 | Act 454 | |
2014-04-10 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2014-03-07 | House | House Hopper |