GA HB1124 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a new charter for the City of Kennesaw, approved May 6, 2013 (Ga. L. 2013, p. 4234), so as to change the provisions relating to the corporate limits of the city; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Kennesaw, City of; change provisions relating to corporate limits
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Setzler [R] | Rep. Charles Gregory [R] | Rep. Stacey Evans [D] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] |
Rep. Rich Golick [R] | Rep. John Carson [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #646 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Vote #732 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Vote #732 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-10 | Act 449 | |
2014-04-10 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2014-03-06 | House | House Hopper |