GA HB1119 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to health, so as to provide for a short title; to provide for legislative findings and purposes; to provide for the development and implementation of an arthritis prevention and control program; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Arthritis Prevention and Control Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Benjie Harbin [R] | Rep. Margaret Kaiser [D] | Rep. Jerry Keen [R] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] |
Rep. Ed Rynders [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #784 - Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-04 | Act 673 | |
2010-06-04 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-31 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-22 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-18 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-18 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-11 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-09 | House Second Readers | |
2010-02-08 | House First Readers |