GA HB1117 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act relating to the Board of Education of Stewart County and providing for the election of the members thereof, approved March 21, 1969 (Ga. L. 1969, p. 2264), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 13, 2008 (Ga. L. 2008, p. 4171), so as to provide for the compensation and expenses of the members of the Board of Education of Stewart County; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Stewart County; Board of Education; provide for compensation and expenses of members
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #659 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - House Vote #649 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - House Vote #649 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 337 | |
2020-06-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-06-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-05 | House | House Hopper |