GA HB1110 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for the unified government of Roberta-Crawford County; to provide for boundaries and districts; to provide for powers and duties; to provide for organization, qualifications, election, terms, compensation, and filling of vacancies; to provide for associated offices, departments, agencies, and personnel; to provide for budgets and financial matters; to provide for a transition period; to provide for the repeal of certain Acts; to provide for a referendum; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Roberta-Crawford County; unified government; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #655 (Y: 49 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House Vote #723 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House Vote #723 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-28 | Act 510 | |
2016-04-28 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-03-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-03-08 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2016-03-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-03-02 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-29 | House | House Hopper |