GA HB1105 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 7 of Article 10 of Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to watercraft held in inventory, so as to provide that watercraft held in inventory for resale shall continue to be exempt from taxation for a limited period of time; to provide for definitions; to provide an effective date; to provide for applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Watercraft held in inventory; exempt from taxation; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Mickey Channell [R] | Rep. Burke Day [R] | Sen. Greg Goggans [R] | Rep. Buddy Harden [R] |
Rep. James Mills [R] | Rep. Carlton Rogers [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #846 - Passage (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-27 | Act 504 | |
2010-05-27 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-07 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-26 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-24 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-18 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-08 | House Second Readers | |
2010-02-05 | House First Readers |